House | 11/09/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Executive Committee | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Amy Elik |