House | 03/18/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr. | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | To Revenue - Tax Credit and Incentives Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond |