Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 6, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Postponed - Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Postponed - Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jed Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jed Davis
|
|
|