House | 09/04/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke | ||
House | 12/19/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan | ||
House | 12/04/2023 | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons | ||
House | 12/04/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe | ||
House | 10/03/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |