House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|