House
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0801
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 072-037-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 015-009-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 039-015-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), the following amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments:
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), the following amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments:
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Executive; 011-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-040-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 019-010-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|