House
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|