House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lilian Jiménez |