House
|
06/06/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0005
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Effective Date June 6, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 069-035-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 069-035-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2, 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 037-016-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 008-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 008-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Housing; 018-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Housing
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|