House
|
08/04/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0441
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 070-035-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 016-006-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 036-018-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Do Pass Agriculture; 008-005-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Waive Posting Notice
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Re-assigned to Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 068-041-001
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 016-010-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|