House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 007-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|