House
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0041
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date August 20, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 046-010-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Education; 010-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-035-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|