House
|
06/07/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-010-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-010-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|