House | 03/20/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aarón M. Ortíz | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |