Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-039-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 019-009-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 019-009-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 017-008-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 019-010-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|