House
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0043
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date June 9, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 036-016-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-003
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|