Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Sponsor Removed Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
To Subcommittee on End of Life Issues
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Sponsor Removed Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 063-038-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 017-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 017-007-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 017-007-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 016-010-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|