House
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Egofske
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|