House
|
05/24/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
To Revenue - Sales, Amusement and Other Taxes Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|