House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam M. Niemerg
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Egofske
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|