House | 02/23/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik | ||
House | 02/23/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha | ||
House | 02/23/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber | ||
House | 12/13/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin | ||
House | 06/09/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie |