House
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|