House
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0181
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date June 30, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Education; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|