House
|
07/19/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0657
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2024
|
Effective Date July 19, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Sponsor Removed Sen. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|