House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0340
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 109-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-002
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 5, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Labor; 015-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Police & Fire Committee; 013-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|