House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | To Revenue - Sales, Amusement and Other Taxes Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond |