House | 03/27/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Do Pass / Short Debate Housing; 011-005-000 | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Housing | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |