House
|
07/31/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0408
|
|
|
House
|
07/31/2023
|
Effective Date July 31, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
07/31/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Veterans Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-000-002
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|