House | 03/31/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | To Revenue - Sales, Amusement and Other Taxes Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |