Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|