Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0343
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass Labor; 016-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|