House
|
09/11/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Small Business, Tech Innovation, and Entrepreneurship Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Small Business, Tech Innovation, and Entrepreneurship Committee; 006-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Small Business, Tech Innovation, and Entrepreneurship Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|