House | 03/06/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Amy Elik |