House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | To Commercial & Property Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |