Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-039-001
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 007-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Re-assigned to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|