House | 05/13/2024 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly | ||
House | 05/13/2024 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella | ||
House | 05/13/2024 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy | ||
House | 05/13/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly | ||
House | 05/13/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella | ||
House | 05/13/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Executive Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr. | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello |