House | 04/18/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Executive Committee | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Executive Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr. |