House | 04/26/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr. | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Ugaste |