House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0346
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 076-033-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 039-017-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Labor; 012-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-034-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-010-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|