House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | To Revenue - Tax Credit and Incentives Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |