Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Randy E. Frese
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Randy E. Frese
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Randy E. Frese
|
|
|