House
|
08/04/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0446
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Effective Date August 4, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 108-000-001
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 108-000-001
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended State Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted; State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 6, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Assigned to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|