House | 04/06/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Executive Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |