House
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0047
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date June 9, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 050-005-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass Education; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 078-025-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 008-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 010-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|