Senate | 04/28/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Assigned to State Government | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Arrive in Senate | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-040-000 | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 019-010-000 | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |