House
|
11/08/2023
|
Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto
|
|
|
House
|
08/16/2023
|
Governor Amendatory Veto
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 House Concurs 063-032-002
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 063-032-002
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 063-032-002
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 3, 4
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 041-009-001
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Education; 012-000-001
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 022-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Public Utilities Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|