House
|
08/04/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0447
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Effective Date August 4, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 111-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 111-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. David Friess
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. David Friess
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Bryant
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 006-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terri Bryant
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terri Bryant
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Postponed - Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Friess
|
|
|