House | 01/30/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour | ||
House | 10/25/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt | ||
House | 09/19/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Ozinga |