House
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0048
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 040-016-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass Labor; 012-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-036-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-010-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|