House
|
08/04/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0449
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 100-006-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass Education; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Postponed - Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|